EP3447602 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE VOLTAGE OF A TRANSFORMER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mieske, Frank Drossener Str. 35 13053 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Wang, Yuting Bödikersteig 11 /3.0G links 13629 Berlin / DE | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 17187264.1 | 22.08.2017 | [2019/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447602 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3447602 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/14 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
G05F1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2019/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REGELN DER SPANNUNG EINES TRANSFORMATORSYSTEMS | [2019/09] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE VOLTAGE OF A TRANSFORMER SYSTEM | [2019/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE RÉGLAGE DE LA TENSION D'UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSFORMATEUR | [2019/09] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 04.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2482415 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]); | [A]CN205583707U (ABB TECHNOLOGY LTD) | Examination | US5210443 | US8321162 | DE102014119158 |