EP3447515 - MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING WITH A VARIABLE FIELD MAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLEICH, Bernhard c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17187453.0 | 23.08.2017 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447515 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/24, G01R33/44, A61B5/053, // G01R33/567, G01R33/48 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
G01R33/246 (EP);
A61B5/0035 (US);
A61B5/05 (US);
A61B5/0536 (US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B5/08 (US);
A61B5/33 (US);
A61B5/6804 (US);
G01R33/38 (US);
G01R33/445 (EP,US);
G01R33/4824 (EP,US);
G01R33/5673 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETRESONANZBILDGEBUNG MIT VARIABLEM FELDMAGNET | [2019/09] | English: | MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING WITH A VARIABLE FIELD MAGNET | [2019/09] | French: | IMAGERIE À RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE COMPRENANT UN AIMANT DE CHAMP VARIABLE | [2019/09] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 11.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6397095 (EYUBOGLU B MURAT [TR], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 8 - column 6, line 40; claim 1 *; | [A] - ROSALIND SADLEIR ET AL, "Noise analysis in magnetic resonance electrical impedance tomography at 3 and 11 T field strengths; Noise analysis in MREIT", PHYSIOLOGICAL MEASUREMENT, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20050808), vol. 26, no. 5, doi:10.1088/0967-3334/26/5/023, ISSN 0967-3334, pages 875 - 884, XP020092236 [A] 1,14,15 * sections 2.3 and 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0967-3334/26/5/023 | [A] - LEE SEUNG-KYUN ET AL, "Tissue Electrical Property Mapping From Zero Echo-Time Magnetic Resonance Imaging", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 34, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TMI.2014.2361810, ISSN 0278-0062, (20141008), pages 541 - 550, (20150130), XP011571655 [A] 1,9,14,15 * chapter III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2014.2361810 | [A] - NATHANIEL I MATTER ET AL, "Rapid Polarizing Field Cycling in Magnetic Resonance Imaging", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAG, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20051227), vol. 25, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TMI.2005.861014, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 84 - 93, XP008141188 [A] 1,14,15 * chapters I, IV and V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2005.861014 | by applicant | US2015153431 |