EP3447964 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ALLOCATING DATA ALLOWANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÇUBUKÇU, Baran C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Flint, Adam Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | Flint, Adam Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 17187976.0 | 25.08.2017 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447964 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04M15/00, H04W4/24 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
H04M15/8214 (EP);
H04L12/14 (EP);
H04L12/1403 (EP);
H04L12/141 (EP);
H04L12/1414 (EP);
H04L12/1417 (EP);
H04L12/1421 (EP);
H04M15/775 (EP);
H04M15/78 (EP);
H04M15/781 (EP);
H04M15/783 (EP);
H04M15/785 (EP);
H04M15/852 (EP);
H04M15/853 (EP);
H04M15/854 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] |
Former [2019/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUTEILUNG EINES VERFÜGBAREN DATENVOLUMENS | [2019/09] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ALLOCATING DATA ALLOWANCE | [2019/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ATTRIBUER UN FORFAIT DE DONNÉES | [2019/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 27.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003091964 (YEAGER JOHN J [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0057] *; | [Y]US2014075012 (PETERSON NATHAN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-19 * * paragraph [0076] *; | [YA]WO2014108801 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [Y] 10-13 * the whole document * [A] 1-9,14,15; | [A]WO2014113019 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2015105045 (ROLFE DAVID [IE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0167] * * paragraph [0170] *; | [A]WO2015161361 (REDKNEE INC [CA]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-23 *; | [A]EP2988475 (XIAOMI INC [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0021] *; | [Y]WO2017115115 (PISMO LABS TECHNOLOGY LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0043] * |