EP3376587 - TEMPERATURE MANAGEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Kenichi c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Takahiro c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Takeuchi, Ryosuke c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Sakuma, Masatake c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 05 /
Toyosaki, Tomohiro c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 06 /
Kobayashi, Takenori c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 17188523.9 | 30.08.2017 | [2018/38] | Priority number, date | JP20170053470 | 17.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017053470 | [2018/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3376587 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/48, H01M10/633, H01M10/663, H01M10/617, H01M10/613 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
H01M10/617 (EP,US);
G01K13/00 (US);
G01K3/04 (US);
G01R31/382 (US);
G01R31/396 (US);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/633 (EP,US);
H01M10/663 (EP,US);
H01M6/5011 (US);
H01M6/5038 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERATURVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/38] | English: | TEMPERATURE MANAGEMENT DEVICE | [2018/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE TEMPÉRATURE | [2018/38] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 30.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10346706 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-19 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] *; | [X]WO2008095313 (ADVANCED LITHIUM POWER INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 7 * * page 10, line 3 - line 14 * * page 18, line 6 - page 20, line 6 * * page 21, line 13 - page 22, line 25 *; | [X]US2010019729 (KAITA KEIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0177] - paragraph [0187] ** paragraph [0202] - paragraph [0207] * |