EP3291513 - INTEGRATED DNS SERVICE PROVIDER SERVICES USING TOKEN-BASED AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VeriSign, Inc. 12061 Bluemont Way Reston, VA 20190 / US | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALISKI, Burton S. c/o Verisign, Inc. Legal Dept., 12061 Bluemont Way RESTON, VA, 20190 / US | 02 /
SHETH, Swapneel c/o Verisign, Inc. Legal Dept., 12061 Bluemont Way RESTON, VA, 20190 / US | 03 /
SHYAMSUNDER, Karthik c/o Verisign, Inc. Legal Dept., 12061 Bluemont Way RESTON, VA, 20190 / US | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | Fontenelle, Sandrine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17188586.6 | 30.08.2017 | [2018/10] | Priority number, date | US201615251716 | 30.08.2016 Original published format: US201615251716 | US201615251497 | 30.08.2016 Original published format: US201615251497 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3291513 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12, H04L29/06 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
H04L61/302 (EP,US);
H04L63/10 (US);
H04L61/4511 (US);
H04L61/5007 (US);
H04L63/0807 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE DNS-DIENSTANBIETERDIENSTE MIT TOKEN-BASIERTER AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG | [2018/10] | English: | INTEGRATED DNS SERVICE PROVIDER SERVICES USING TOKEN-BASED AUTHENTICATION | [2018/10] | French: | SERVICES DE PRESTATAIRE DE SERVICE DNS INTÉGRÉS UTILISANT UNE AUTHENTIFICATION À BASE DE JETONS | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010325723 (ESSAWI TARIK [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0020] *; | [A]US2012174198 (GOULD JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0016] *; | [A]US8745718 (DUFEL MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-14* column 2, paragraph 39 - column 4, paragraph 25 *; | [A] - M Hunt, "System for Managing a Shared Domain Registry; draft-nzrs-srs-03", (20101129), pages 1 - 169, URL: https://docs.nzrs.net.nz/_downloads/draft-nzrs-srs-03.pdf, (20170123), XP055337934 [A] 1-14 * page 1 - page 15 * |