EP3290640 - RETAINING ASSEMBLY WITH TABS AND RETAINING RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2018/10] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUONG, Conway 20 Peila Drive Manchester, CT 06040 / US | 02 /
WILSON, Ross 68 Old Farms Road South Glastonbury, CT 06073 / US | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17188824.1 | 31.08.2017 | [2018/10] | Priority number, date | US201615253957 | 01.09.2016 Original published format: US201615253957 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290640 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30, F01D5/34, F01D9/04 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
F01D5/3007 (EP,US);
F01D5/30 (US);
F01D5/3015 (EP,US);
F01D5/34 (EP);
F01D9/042 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (EP,US);
F05D2230/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2018/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTEANORDNUNG MIT LASCHEN UND HALTERING | [2018/10] | English: | RETAINING ASSEMBLY WITH TABS AND RETAINING RING | [2018/10] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE RETENUE AVEC LANGUETTES ET BAGUE DE RETENUE | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3656865 (SPEARS ESTEN W JR) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 35; figures 1-6; claims 1-4 * [I] 12-14; | [XI]WO2010067024 (TURBOMECA [FR], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 6, line 28 - page 9, line 25; figures 1-4; claims 1-12 * [I] 12-14; | [XI]FR2951224 (TURBOMECA [FR]) [X] 1-11 * page 5, line 34 - page 9, line 26; figures 1-5; claims 1-4,13 * [I] 12-14; | [XI]US2013156589 (PAQUET RENE [CA], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-5; claims 1-6 *[I] 12-14 |