EP3272386 - VACUUM SPONGE DRAINAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lohmann & Rauscher GmbH & Co. KG Irlicher Strasse 55 56567 Neuwied / DE | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schorsch, Tobias Paul Heinrich Jes-Juhl-Weg 18 22095 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Loske, Gunnar Waldemar-Bonsels-Weg 8a 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Daniel Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | Seranski, Klaus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstraße 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17189242.5 | 22.07.2010 | [2018/04] | Priority number, date | DE20091043472 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009043472 | DE20091057374 | 09.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009057374 | DE20101013271 | 29.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010013271 | DE20101013439 | 30.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010013439 | DE20101013849 | 01.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010013849 | DE20101013848 | 01.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010013848 | [2018/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3272386 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M27/00, A61M1/00 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
A61M27/00 (EP,US);
A61B1/00135 (US);
A61B1/12 (US);
A61B1/2736 (US);
A61B17/22 (US);
A61B90/39 (US);
A61F13/36 (US);
A61M1/85 (EP,US);
A61M1/916 (EP,US);
A61M1/92 (EP,US);
A61M1/94 (EP,US);
A61M25/09 (US);
A61B2090/3966 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1021 (US);
A61M2210/1042 (US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | VAKUUMSCHWAMMDRAINAGE | [2018/04] | English: | VACUUM SPONGE DRAINAGE | [2018/04] | French: | DRAINAGE PAR ÉPONGE SOUS VIDE | [2018/04] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 04.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10739328.2 / EP2482912 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6123697 (SHIPPERT RONALD D [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10-13,15,27 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 62 * * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 45 * * column 8, line 22 - column 9, line 35 * * figures 7,8 *; | [X]WO03028786 (SOLEM JAN OTTO [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,8-13,15 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 32 * * page 22, line 6 - line 28 * * page 28, line 32 - page 29, line 13 * * figure 23 *; | [Y]WO2004041346 (WEIDENHAGEN ROLF [DE], et al) [Y] 21 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraphs [0037] , [0041] * * figures 2,3 *; | [XIY]US2007219497 (JOHNSON ROYCE W [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13,15-17,19-20,22-24,27 * figures 4B,6-8,21-22 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0065] , [0070] - [0071] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0125] * [I] 7 [Y] 21; | [X]US2007282310 (BENGTSON BRADLEY P [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,11-13,15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0055] * * figures 4,9 *; | [PX]DE102008061535 (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [PX] 1-5,9,11-16,22,24 * paragraphs [0020] , [0025] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] ** figures 1-3 * | by applicant | WO2004041346 |