EP3301443 - MEDICAL ANALYSIS DEVICE AND CELL ANALYSIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, 3-chome, Wakinohama-cho Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | For all designated states Yamagata University 1-4-12, Kojirakawamachi Yamagata-shi, Yamagata 990-8560 / JP | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAGAWA, Yasuhisa c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries. Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Masaru c/o Yamagata University, Faculty of Engineering 4-3-16, Jonan Yonezawa-shi, Yamagata 992-8510 / JP | 03 /
HOSHIBA, Takashi c/o Yamagata University, Faculty of Engineering 4-3-16, Jonan Yonezawa-shi, Yamagata 992-8510 / JP | 04 /
SHIBUYA, Tomokazu c/o Yamagata University, Faculty of Engineering 4-3-16, Jonan Yonezawa-shi, Yamagata 992-8510 / JP | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2018/14] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17189342.3 | 05.09.2017 | [2018/14] | Priority number, date | JP20160191617 | 29.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016191617 | JP20170144556 | 26.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017144556 | [2018/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301443 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3301443 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, B01L3/00 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/5005 (EP,US);
G01N33/48 (CN);
C12M23/12 (US);
B01L3/5085 (EP,US);
C08F120/28 (CN);
C12M23/20 (US);
C12M25/04 (US);
C12M3/04 (US);
B01L2300/0829 (EP,US);
B01L2300/16 (US);
B01L2300/161 (EP,US);
B01L3/5021 (EP,US);
C12N2533/56 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] |
Former [2018/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG UND ZELLANALYSEVERFAHREN | [2018/14] | English: | MEDICAL ANALYSIS DEVICE AND CELL ANALYSIS METHOD | [2018/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE MÉDICALE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE CELLULAIRE | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 27.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | IE | 05.09.2023 | LU | 05.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | GB | 12.10.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 05.09.2023 | ||
LU | 05.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
GB | 12.10.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 05.09.2023 | ||
LU | 05.09.2023 | ||
GB | 12.10.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 05.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 05.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 05.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002155617 (PHAM ANDREW A [US], et al) [Y] 1-8* paragraph [0089] *; | [Y]US2006160066 (BHATIA SANGEETA N [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * claim - * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0131] *; | [Y]US2010261159 (HESS ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * claim 81 * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0281] *; | [Y]WO2011157805 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-8 * claim - * * page 10, line 3 - line 11 * * page 11, line 1 - line 20 *; | [Y]WO2011161480 (IMP INNOVATIONS LTD, et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0066] * * figure - *; | [Y]WO2015137259 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * claim - * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0050] *; | [Y]WO2016103002 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH]) [Y] 1-8 * claim - * * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 21 * * page 8, line 27 - line 30; figure - * | by applicant | JP2005523981 |