EP3296521 - CONTROLLING TURBINE SHROUD CLEARANCE FOR OPERATIONAL PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHAI, George Vargese 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA Georgia 30339 / US | 02 /
FISHER, William Theadore 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA Georgia 30339 / US | 03 /
KLOSINSKI, Joseph Philip 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA Georgia 30339 / US | 04 /
SCIPIO, Alston Ilford 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA Georgia 30339 / US | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Foster, Christopher Michael General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 17189763.0 | 07.09.2017 | [2018/12] | Priority number, date | US201615264058 | 13.09.2016 Original published format: US201615264058 | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3296521 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/20, F01D11/14 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
F01D11/14 (EP,US);
F02C9/48 (US);
F01D11/22 (EP,US);
F01D11/24 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (US);
F02C6/18 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2220/72 (US);
F05D2240/128 (US);
F05D2240/307 (US);
F05D2270/101 (EP,US);
F05D2270/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] |
Former [2018/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DES TURBINENUMMANTELUNGSSPIELS ZUM BETRIEBSSCHUTZ | [2018/12] | English: | CONTROLLING TURBINE SHROUD CLEARANCE FOR OPERATIONAL PROTECTION | [2018/12] | French: | COMMANDE DE DÉGAGEMENT DE CHEMISE DE TURBINE POUR PROTECTION OPÉRATIONNELLE | [2018/12] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 15.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010269481 (SNIDER DAVID AUGUST [US], et al) [Y] 3,10 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] , [0022] , [0024] , [0026] , [0027] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0037] *; | [Y]EP2369141 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1,2,5-9,12-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0003] , [ 0012]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0013] *; | [A]US2012076634 (VALLIAPPAN LAKSHMANAN [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figures 3,4 *; | [YA]EP2843198 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-3,5-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0042] * [A] 4,11; | [Y]US2016047269 (ZACCHERA KEVIN [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0044] * |