EP3293791 - BATTERY SYSTEM HOUSING WITH INTERNAL BUSBAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thunder Power New Energy Vehicle Development Company Limited 9/F 1 Lyndhurst Terrace Central, Hong Kong / CN | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASTRANDREA, Francesco 9/F, 1 Lyndhurst Terrace Central Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
TUTZER, Peter 9/F, 1 Lyndhurst Terrace Central Hong Kong / CN | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Sadler, Peter Frederick Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2018/11] | Application number, filing date | 17189815.8 | 07.09.2017 | [2018/11] | Priority number, date | US201662384298P | 07.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662384298 P | US201715603007 | 23.05.2017 Original published format: US201715603007 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3293791 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M2/20, H01M10/613, H01M10/625, H01M10/6556 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
H01M10/613 (EP,CN,US);
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/643 (EP,US);
H01M10/6554 (CN);
H01M10/6556 (EP,US);
H01M10/6557 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/227 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/507 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/522 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2001/0438 (US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/233 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/289 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2018/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIESYSTEMGEHÄUSE MIT INTERNER STROMSCHIENE | [2018/11] | English: | BATTERY SYSTEM HOUSING WITH INTERNAL BUSBAR | [2018/11] | French: | BOÎTIER DE SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE AVEC BARRE OMNIBUS INTERNE | [2018/11] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 18.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009297892 (IJAZ MUJEEB [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0062] , [0068] - [0070] - [0072] , [0075] , [0083]; figures 3a, 4a * [Y] 2,9; | [Y]JP2012221801 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [Y] 2,9 * paragraph [0033]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP2722909 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 3,10* the whole document * |