EP3293086 - TRUNK AS STIFFENING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thunder Power New Energy Vehicle Development Company Limited RM 901 1 Lyndhurst Terrace Central, Hong Kong / CN | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIER, Jens 9/F, 1 Lyndhurst Terrace Central Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
VIERLING, Maik 9/F, 1 Lyndhurst Terrace Central Hong Kong / CN | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Smith, Christopher William Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2018/11] | Application number, filing date | 17189997.4 | 07.09.2017 | [2018/11] | Priority number, date | US201662384298P | 07.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662384298 P | US201715696937 | 06.09.2017 Original published format: US201715696937 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3293086 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15, B62D25/08, B62D25/20, B60R5/02, B62D29/00 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
B62D25/087 (EP,US);
B60R19/34 (US);
B60R5/02 (US);
B62D21/152 (EP,US);
B62D21/157 (EP,US);
B62D25/2018 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2018/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOFFERRAUM ALS VERSTEIFUNGSELEMENT | [2018/11] | English: | TRUNK AS STIFFENING ELEMENT | [2018/11] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE RAIDISSEMENT DU COFFRE | [2018/11] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]DE102011050652 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [I] 1,4 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5-9; | [IY]CN105109554 (UNIV SUN YAT SEN) [I] 1,4,10 * the whole document * [Y] 11-15; | [I]US2010052342 (WURTEMBERGER RALF [DE]) [I] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [IY]JP2010058737 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [I] 1,10 * the whole document * [Y] 9,12,15; | [Y]EP0937631 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3,5-7,13,14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004113462 (WINTER FRED [DE], et al) [Y] 8,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US8641133 (SCARINGE ROBERT JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 4 * figures 11,14 * |