EP3456417 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMMINUTION CIRCUIT AND RESPECTIVE COMMINUTION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Georg Farmanstrasse 54 8152 Glattpark / CH | 02 /
PAUL, Thomas Alfred Einsiedlerstrasse 3 8820 Wädenswil / CH | 03 /
KRAMER, Axel Mittelstrasse 11 5430 Wettingen / CH | 04 /
PAPE, Deltlef General-Guisanstrasse 49 5415 Nussbaumen / CH | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/12] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 17191631.5 | 18.09.2017 | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3456417 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B02C25/00, B02C17/18 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
B02C25/00 (EP);
B02C17/1805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES ZERKLEINERUNGSKREISES UND ZUGEHÖRIGER ZERKLEINERUNGSKREIS | [2019/12] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMMINUTION CIRCUIT AND RESPECTIVE COMMINUTION CIRCUIT | [2019/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN CIRCUIT DE BROYAGE ET CIRCUIT DE BROYAGE RESPECTIF | [2019/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/08] | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102006019417 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0041]; figure 1 *; | [AD] - GUYOT O ET AL, "VisioRock, an integrated vision technology for advanced control of comminution circuits", MINERALS ENGINEERING, PERGAMON PRESS , OXFORD, GB, (20041101), vol. 17, no. 11-12, doi:10.1016/J.MINENG.2004.05.017, ISSN 0892-6875, pages 1227 - 1235, XP004615423 [AD] 1-15 * page 1234, line 14 - line 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mineng.2004.05.017 | by applicant | - O. GUYOT et al., "VisioRock, an integrated vision technology for advanced control of comminution circuits", Minerals Engineering, (20040000), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1016/j.mineng.2004.05.017, pages 1227 - 1235, XP004615423 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mineng.2004.05.017 |