EP3457408 - HEALTHCARE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dominick, Lutz In-der-Au 12 91330 Eggolsheim / DE | 02 /
Ukis, Vladyslav Georg-Strobel-Str. 40 90489 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 17191855.0 | 19.09.2017 | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3457408 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3457408 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G16H10/60, G16H30/20, G16H40/20 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G06F16/51 (US);
G06F21/6218 (US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H40/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | G16H40/67, G16H10/60, G16H10/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | GESUNDHEITSVERSORGUNGSNETZWERK | [2019/12] | English: | HEALTHCARE NETWORK | [2019/12] | French: | RÉSEAU DE SOINS DE SANTÉ | [2019/12] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 19.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.04.2021 | 21.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2017 | AL | 15.09.2021 | AT | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | ES | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | IT | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | NL | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | TR | 15.09.2021 | IE | 19.09.2021 | LU | 19.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | CH | 30.09.2021 | LI | 30.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.09.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.09.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
IE | 19.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 19.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006026205 (BUTTERFIELD ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1,4-16 * [0015]-[0023]; [0044]-[0046]; [0048]-[0065]; [0070]-[0071]; [0100]; [0102]; [0106]-[0109];; figures 1-2 * [I] 2,3; | [X]US2009036750 (WEINSTEIN WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * [0008]-[0013]; [0060]-[0063] *; | [X]US2009177249 (ROBERTS NICK [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * [0003]-[0005]; [0007]; [0010]; [0066] * * [0093]-[0110]; [0113];; figures 3-4 * * [0118]-[0123];; figure 6 * * [0126]; [0154]-[0155]; [0235]-[0239];; figures 7, 11 * * [0145]-[0160];; figures 9-16 *; | [A]US2012215799 (BOHNER WENDY LYNNE [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * [0002]; [0015]-[; [0026]-[0028] * * [0029]-[0037];; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2014278536 (ZHANG DONGXIAO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11,14-16 * [0003]-[0005]; [0007]-[0015]; [0037]-[0040]; [0045]-[0047]; [0058]-[0060]; [0072]-[0074];; figure 2; claims 1-32 * [I] 3,5-10; | [A]US2015363562 (HALLWACHS JOACHIM H [US]) [A] 1-16* [0041]; [0044]; [0059]; [0061] *; | [A]US2016019294 (DONG LIJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US2016283665 (SAMPATH ANAND [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * |