EP3459464 - WEARABLE ULTRASOUND PATCH AND APPLICATION METHOD OF SUCH A PATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKERS, Lucas Johannes Anna Maria c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HAKKENS, Franciscus Johannes Gerardus c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BERBEN, Edward Theodorus Maria c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
GROB, Timon Rutger c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 17192009.3 | 20.09.2017 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3459464 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
A61B8/4236 (EP,US);
A61B8/4281 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AM KÖRPER TRAGBARER ULTRASCHALLPATCH UND ANBRINGUNGSVERFAHREN SOLCH EINES PATCHES | [2019/13] | English: | WEARABLE ULTRASOUND PATCH AND APPLICATION METHOD OF SUCH A PATCH | [2019/13] | French: | TIMBRE À ULTRASONS VESTIMENTAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'APPLICATION D'UN TEL TIMBRE | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 16.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]DE3133434 (BUCHALTER GILBERT) [I] 1-4,10-14 * the whole document * [A] 5-9,15; | [A]US2006015058 (KELLOGG SCOTT C [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0070] - [0074]; figure - *; | [A]WO2011163570 (ZETROZ LLC [US], et al) [A] 5-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012277640 (LEWIS JR GEORGE K [US], et al) [A] 5-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014276048 (KILEY SEAN P [US], et al) [A] 10 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 22] - [0027]; figure - * | by applicant | US2005074407 |