EP3301536 - HIGH VOLTAGE HIGH EFFICIENCY VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TACO, INC. 1160 Cranston Street Cranston Rhode Island 02920 / US | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLICKER, Robert 22 Prospect Street Upton, Massachusetts 01568 / US | 02 /
BRINDAMOUR, JR., Richard F. 49 Apple Blossom Lane Cranston, Rhode Island 02921 / US | 03 /
CARREIRO, Robert J. 73 Brentwood Ct. Swansen, Massachusetts 02777 / US | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/14] | 01 /
KELLICKER, Robert 22 Prospect Street Upton, MA Massachusetts 01568 / US | ||
02 /
BRINDAMOUR, JR., Richard F. 49 Apple Blossom Lane Cranston, RI Rhode Island 02921 / US | |||
03 /
CARREIRO, Robert J. 73 Brentwood Ct. Swansen, MA Massachusetts 02777 / US | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/50] |
Former [2018/14] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17193014.2 | 25.09.2017 | [2018/14] | Priority number, date | US201662398979P | 23.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662398979 P | [2018/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301536 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3301536 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
G05D23/19 (EP,US);
F16K27/029 (US);
F16K19/003 (EP);
F16K27/0236 (US);
F16K31/046 (EP);
F16K31/055 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/14] | Title | German: | HOCHEFFIZIENTES HOCHSPANNUNGSVENTIL | [2018/14] | English: | HIGH VOLTAGE HIGH EFFICIENCY VALVE | [2018/14] | French: | SOUPAPE À HAUTE TENSION ET HAUTE EFFICACITÉ | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 04.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 03.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2023 | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 13.12.2023 | |
CZ | 13.12.2023 | ||
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0717332 (ALFORD ANTHONY [GB], et al); | [A]WO9960291 (TACO INC [US]); | [A]WO2007003935 (CALL RES & DESIGN LTD 1 [GB], et al) | Examination | US4796580 | US2009108220 |