EP3364693 - WI-FI CONNECTION METHOD, MOBILE TERMINAL AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2019/30] | For all designated states Guangdong Oppo Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2018/34] | For all designated states Guangdong Oppo Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Yi c/o GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
CU, Botao c/o GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
HU, Yadong c/o GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangxi 523860 / CN | 04 /
JIANG, Shimin c/o GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2019/30] |
Former [2018/34] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17193566.1 | 27.09.2017 | [2018/34] | Priority number, date | CN20171090716 | 20.02.2017 Original published format: CN201710090716 | [2018/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3364693 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3364693 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, // H04W84/12 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (CN,US);
H04L63/061 (US);
H04L63/08 (US);
H04W12/03 (EP,US);
H04W12/04 (US);
H04W48/16 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/10 (CN,US);
H04W8/005 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR WI-FI-VERBINDUNG, MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2018/34] | English: | WI-FI CONNECTION METHOD, MOBILE TERMINAL AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2018/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONNEXION WI-FI, TERMINAL MOBILE ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2018/34] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 27.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2017 | AL | 24.07.2019 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | DK | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | HR | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MK | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | RS | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | SM | 24.07.2019 | TR | 24.07.2019 | IE | 27.09.2019 | LU | 27.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | NO | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | IS | 24.11.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.09.2017 | |
AL | 24.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
MT | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.09.2017 | |
AL | 24.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | |
NO | 24.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]US2004110530 (ALONE VIJAY B [IN], et al) [I] 1,8,13-15 * abstract * * figures 1-15 * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0092] * [A] 2,4-7,9,11,12 [Y] 3,10; | [A]US2008082543 (ABHISHEK ABHISHEK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036] ** paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] *; | [XYI]US2008130595 (ABDEL-KADER SHERIF ALY [CA]) [X] 1,2,7-9,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * [Y] 3,4,10 [I] 5,6,11,12; | [A]US2008198811 (DESHPANDE MANOJ M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] , [0044] , [0046] * * paragraphs [0051] , [0060] , [0061] * * paragraphs [0068] , [0077] , [0 79] *; | [IAY]US2010309815 (YEPEZ ROBERTO GABRIEL [US], et al) [I] 1,8,13-15 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * [A] 2,3,5-7,9-12 [Y] 4 |