EP3284535 - METALLO-SILICATE MATERIAL SUITABLE FOR THE CONVERSION OF SUGARS INTO LACTIC ACID AND 2-HYDROXY-3-BUTENOIC ACID OR ESTERS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLM, Martin Spangsberg 33 Cave Street Oxford OX4 1BE / GB | 02 /
SADABA ZUBIRI, Irantzu Dirch Passers Allé 11, 4 th 2000 Frederiksberg / DK | 03 /
TOLBORG, Søren Vangedevej 226A, 1 TV 2870 Dyssegård / DK | 04 /
MÅRUP OSMUNDSEN, Christian Jægersborg Alle 247, 3.tv. 2820 Gentofte / DK | 05 /
TAARNING, Esben Smallegade 24, 3th 2000 Frederiksberg / DK | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Topsoe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Application number, filing date | 17193723.8 | 15.08.2014 | [2018/08] | Priority number, date | EP20130181069 | 20.08.2013 Original published format: EP 13181069 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3284535 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/70, C07C69/68 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
B01J29/7057 (EP,US);
B01J29/088 (US);
B01J29/7049 (US);
B01J37/04 (US);
B01J37/08 (US);
B01J37/10 (US);
| C-Set: |
C07C67/00, C07C69/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] |
Former [2018/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | METALLSILIKATE UND VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON ZUCKERN IN MILCHSÄUREESTER, 2-HYDROXY-3-BUTENSÄURE UND MILCHSÄURE, DIE SELBST EIN METALLSILIKAT UND EIN METALLION ENTHÄLT | [2018/08] | English: | METALLO-SILICATE MATERIAL SUITABLE FOR THE CONVERSION OF SUGARS INTO LACTIC ACID AND 2-HYDROXY-3-BUTENOIC ACID OR ESTERS THEREOF | [2018/08] | French: | METALLO-SILICATES ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA CONVERSION DE SUCRES EN ESTERS D'ACIDE LACTIQUE, ACIDE 2-HYDROXY-3-BUTENOIC ET ACIDE LACTIQUE ELLE-MÊME COMPORTANT DU METALLO-SILICATE ET UN ION MÉTALLIQUE | [2018/08] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 13.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14752847.5 / EP3036040 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4933161 (VAUGHAN DAVID E W [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP2184270 (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK]) [AD] 1-16* the whole document *; | [X] - Eranda Nikolla ET AL, "S1 Supporting Information for: "One-Pot" Synthesis of HMF from Carbohydrates using Tin-Beta Zeolite", (20110307), URL: https://authors.library.caltech.edu/23562/2/cs2000544_si_001.pdf, (20171025), XP055418993 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | [AD] - QIANG GUO ET AL, "Highly Active and Recyclable Sn-MWW Zeolite Catalyst for Sugar Conversion to Methyl Lactate and Lactic Acid", CHEMSUSCHEM, (20130617), vol. 6, no. 8, doi:10.1002/cssc.201300160, ISSN 1864-5631, pages 1352 - 1356, XP055089633 [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cssc.201300160 | [AD] - CERI HAMMOND ET AL, "Simple and Scalable Preparation of Highly Active Lewis Acidic Sn-[beta]", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20121119), vol. 51, no. 47, doi:10.1002/anie.201206193, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 11736 - 11739, XP055093534 [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201206193 | by applicant | US6306364 | EP1010667 | EP2184270 | - HOLM, Science, (20100000), vol. 328, pages 602 - 605 | - Chem Commun., (19970000), pages 425 - 426 | - HERMANS et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20120000), vol. 51, pages 11736 - 11739 | - QIANG et al., ChemSus-Chem, (20130800), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 1352 - 1356 | - BERMEJO-DEVAL et al., PNAS, (20120000), vol. 109, no. 25 | - KHOUW et al., J. Catal., (19950000), vol. 151, pages 77 - 86 | - CORMA et al., Chem. Rev., (19950000), vol. 95, pages 559 - 614 | - HERMANS, Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20120000), vol. 51, pages 11736 - 11739 | - CAMPNANATI et al., Catalysis Today, (20030000), vol. 77, pages 299 - 314 | - LI, L. et al., Green Chem., (20110000), vol. 13, pages 1175 - 1181 |