EP3299110 - ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING APPARATUS WITH A PROCESSING CHAMBER AND AN OPTICAL MODULE HAVING A HOUSE CONTAINING OPTICAL TRAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/13] | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING APPARATUS WITH A PROCESSING CHAMBER AND AN OPTICAL MODULE HAVING A HOUSE CONTAINING OPTICAL TRAIN | ||
[2019/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw PLC New Mills Wotton-under-Edge, Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCOTT, Simon Peter Aspen Parkwood Drive, Baldwins Gate Newcastle-Under-Lyme, Staffordshire ST5 5EU / GB | 02 /
SUTCLIFFE, Christopher John Renishaw plc Brooms Road Stone Business Park Stone, Staffordshire ST15 0SH / GB | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Paul, et al Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge, Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 17194598.3 | 07.09.2009 | [2018/13] | Priority number, date | GB20080016308 | 05.09.2008 Original published format: GB 0816308 | [2018/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3299110 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3299110 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3299110 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/12, B23K26/34, B23K26/70, B23K26/08, B23K26/04, B22F3/105, B29C67/00 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
B23K26/046 (EP,US);
B22F12/38 (EP,US);
B22F12/44 (EP,US);
B22F12/90 (EP,US);
B23K26/04 (US);
B23K26/082 (EP,US);
B23K26/12 (EP,US);
B23K26/127 (EP,US);
B23K26/34 (EP,US);
B23K26/703 (EP,US);
B23K35/0244 (EP,US);
B29C64/268 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
B22F3/003 (US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F10/28, B22F2201/11, B22F2201/12 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00, B22F3/003 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] |
Former [2018/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG MIT EINER BEARBEITUNGSKAMMER UND EIN OPTISCHES SYSTEM AUFWEISENDEN OPTISCHEN MODULE | [2019/31] | English: | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING APPARATUS WITH A PROCESSING CHAMBER AND AN OPTICAL MODULE HAVING A HOUSE CONTAINING OPTICAL TRAINS | [2019/31] | French: | APPAREIL DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE AU MOYEN D'UNE CHAMBRE DE TRAITEMENT ET D'UN MODULE OPTIQUE COMPRENANT DES TRAJETS OPTIQUE | [2019/31] |
Former [2018/13] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG MIT EINER BEARBEITUNGSKAMMER UND EINEM EIN OPTISCHES SYSTEM AUFWEISENDEN OPTISCHEN MODUL | ||
Former [2018/13] | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING APPARATUS WITH A PROCESSING CHAMBER AND AN OPTICAL MODULE HAVING A HOUSE CONTAINING OPTICAL TRAIN | ||
Former [2018/13] | APPAREIL DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE AU MOYEN D'UNE CHAMBRE DE TRAITEMENT ET D'UN MODULE OPTIQUE COMPRENANT UN TRAJET OPTIQUE | Examination procedure | 19.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 19.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.07.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09785069.7 / EP2342042 | Divisional application(s) | EP21215508.9 / EP4023387 | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2009 | AT | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | DK | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | ES | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | IT | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | NL | 22.12.2021 | PL | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | SE | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | BG | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | IE | 07.09.2022 | LU | 07.09.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 07.09.2009 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.09.2009 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
IE | 07.09.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
LU | 07.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002011584 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-8,10 * abstract ** paragraphs [0011] - [0012]; figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US2002090313 (WANG XINHUA [SG], et al) [Y] 1-8,10 * paragraphs [0035] - [0039]; figure - *; | [Y]JP2004082166 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 8,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0020]; figure - *; | [Y]WO2007007379 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8,10 * paragraph [0149]; figure 17 *; | [Y]US2008124433 (YELDEN EUGENE F [US], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0019]; figure - * |