EP3466858 - METHOD OF PLANNING PLATFORM LIFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Stairlifts B.V. Van Utrechtweg 99 2921 LN Krimpen aan den IJssel / NL | For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Stairlifts B.V. Van Utrechtweg 99 2921 LN Krimpen aan de IJssel / NL | ||
For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Felis, Thomas 806 W. Crockett Sr. Seattle WA 98119 / US | 02 /
de Kleer, Pieter-Bas Prinses Beatrixlaan 336 2273 XX, Voorburg / NL | 03 /
Feismann, Simon Unter der Mühle 74 40667 Meerbusch / DE | 04 /
Saba, Isaak Modaser Moltkeplatz 23 45138 Essen / DE | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17194814.4 | 04.10.2017 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3466858 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B66B9/08 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B66B9/08 (EP,US);
B66B9/0846 (US);
G06F30/13 (US);
G06F2119/18 (US);
G06Q50/08 (US);
G06T19/006 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PLANUNG EINER HEBEBÜHNE | [2019/15] | English: | METHOD OF PLANNING PLATFORM LIFT | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PLANIFICATION DE PLATEFORME DE LEVAGE | [2019/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 25.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2016028146 (HANDICARE STAIRLIFTS B V [NL]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * page 9, line 22 - page 11, line 22 * * page 13, line 35 - page 14, line 14 * * figures 1, 2, 4 * [A] 7-10 [I] 2-5,11,12; | [AD]EP2825841 (OOMS OTTO BV [NL]) [AD] 1-12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0030] ** figures 1-4 *; | [E]EP3225580 (HAWLE TREPPENLIFTE GMBH [DE]) [E] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1554210 | WO2013129923 | WO2015052489 | EP2825841 |