EP3467099 - METHOD FOR THE FERMENTATIVE PRODUCTION OF L-AMINO ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2019/50] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEKEL, Thomas Berghagen 21 33790 Halle (Westf.) / DE | 02 /
THIERBACH, Georg, Dr. Lange Wiese 21 33613 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
VOSS, Kornelia, Dr. Dürkoppstrasse 12 33790 Halle / DE | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management PB 84/339 Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17194981.1 | 05.10.2017 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467099 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, C07K14/34, C12P13/06, C12P13/08, C12P13/10, C12P13/24 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
C12P13/08 (EP,CN,US);
C12P13/06 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FERMENTATIVEN HERSTELLUNG VON L-AMINOSÄUREN | [2019/15] | English: | METHOD FOR THE FERMENTATIVE PRODUCTION OF L-AMINO ACIDS | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDES AMINÉS L PAR FERMENTATION | [2019/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO0100804 (BASF AG [DE]) [XD] 1-10,20 * page 6, line 1 - line 13; example 11; claim 36 * [I] 11-19,21-26; | [A] - ATIKA HADIATI ET AL, "Engineering of Corynebacterium glutamicum for growth and production of L-ornithine, L-lysine, and lycopene from hexuronic acids", BIORESOURCES AND BIOPROCESSING, (20141201), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s40643-014-0025-5, pages 1 - 10, XP055427562 [A] 1-26 * page 7 - page 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s40643-014-0025-5 | by applicant | EP1108790 | WO0100804 | WO2008033001 | EP0841395 | US5688671 | US6844176 | US6893848 | WO2009141330 | EP2796555 | EP0385940 | US5188948 | EP2811028 | US4656135 | US4495283 | EP1828384 | EP2553113 | EP1239040 | WO9918228 | EP2107128 | EP0219027 | EP0387527 | EP0197335 | US8637295 | EP0811682 | EP0868527 | US6670156 | EP1094111 | US5770409 | US5990350 | US5275940 | US5763230 | US6025169 | US5279744 | US4956471 | US5431933 | - TOSAKA et al., Agricultural and Biological Chemistry, (19780000), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 745 - 752 | - IKEDA; NAKAGAWA, Applied Microbiology and Biotechnology, (20030000), vol. 62, pages 99 - 109 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. NC_003450 | - YUKAWA et al., Microbiology, (20070000), vol. 153, no. 4, pages 1042 - 1058 | - LV et al., Journal of Bacteriology, (20120000), vol. 194, no. 3, pages 742 - 743 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. NZ_CP016335 | - KIM et al., Molecules and Cells, (20010000), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 112 - 116 | - FOLLETTIE et al., Journal of Bacteriology, (19930000), vol. 175, no. 13, pages 4096 - 4103 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. AF237667 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. BAC00079 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. KEI24239 | - LIEBL et al., International Journal of Systematic Bacteriology, (19910000), vol. 41, no. 2, pages 255 - 260 | - YANG, BMC Genomics, vol. 18, no. 1, page 940 | - BLOMBACH et al., Applied and Environmental Microbiology, (20090000), vol. 75, no. 2, pages 419 - 427 | - EGGELING; BOTT, Applied Microbiology and Biotechnology, (20150000), vol. 99, no. 9, pages 3387 - 3394 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 18323-44-9 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 21462-39-5 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. BAV24312 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. BAF55600 | - SWENSON et al., Manual of Clinical Microbiology, American Society for Microbiology, (19950000), pages 1356 - 1367 | - SCHWARZER; PIIHLER, Bio/Technology, (19910000), vol. 9, pages 84 - 87 | - SCHAFER et al., Gene, (19940000), vol. 145, pages 69 - 73 | - PETERS-WENDISCH et al., Microbiology, (19980000), vol. 144, pages 915 - 927 | - R. KELLE, L-lysine Production | - SPACKMAN et al., Analytical Chemistry, (19580000), vol. 30, pages 1190 - 1206 | - Magazine of Chromatographic Science, (19890000), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 484 - 487 | - LINDROTH et al., Analytical Chemistry, (19790000), vol. 51, pages 1167 - 1174 |