EP3306315 - METHOD FOR COLLECTING RARE CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAGI, Hidenori c/o ARKRAY, Inc., Kyoto Laboratory Yousuien-nai 59 Gansuin-cho, Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-0008 / JP | 02 /
KOZUKA, Masahiro c/o ARKRAY, Inc., Kyoto Laboratory Yousuien-nai 59 Gansuin-cho, Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-0008 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Hiroshi c/o ARKRAY, Inc., Kyoto Laboratory Yousuien-nai 59 Gansuin-cho, Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 602-0008 / JP | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Jones, Elizabeth Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17194998.5 | 05.10.2017 | [2018/15] | Priority number, date | JP20160198422 | 06.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016198422 | JP20170194023 | 04.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017194023 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3306315 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
G01N33/52 (EP,US);
G01N1/34 (CN);
G01N33/491 (US);
G01N1/40 (CN);
G01N33/48 (US);
G01N33/5002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SAMMELN VON SELTENEN ZELLEN | [2018/15] | English: | METHOD FOR COLLECTING RARE CELLS | [2018/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COLLECTE DE CELLULES RARES | [2018/15] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 21.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014008210 (GUIA ANTONIO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-15 * the whole document * * In particular: Figures 1-32; Paragraphs 12-15, 21, 25, 32-37, 39, 40, 65-73, 125-131, 133-144, 163-169, 216-308 (i.e. sections II to IV); More particularly paragraphs 243-249 and 275-278. *; | [X]US2015118728 (RAHMAN ABDUR RUB ABDUR [SG], et al) [X] 1-4,8-15 * the whole document * * In particular: Figures 1-25; Paragraphs 17-52, 153-160 and 217-309 (i.e. examples 1 and 2). *; | [X] - DAVID ISSADORE ET AL, "Self-assembled magnetic filter for highly efficient immunomagnetic separation", LAB ON A CHIP, (20110101), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.1039/C0LC00149J, ISSN 1473-0197, page 147, XP055049322 [X] 1-4,8-15 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Methods section; Figures 4 and 5. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C0LC00149J | [Y] - JEGATHA NAMBI KRISHNAN ET AL, "Rapid microfluidic separation of magnetic beads through dielectrophoresis and magnetophoresis", PROTEOMICS, DE, (20090501), vol. 30, no. 9, doi:10.1002/elps.200800646, ISSN 0173-0835, pages 1457 - 1463, XP055429663 [Y] 1-4,8-15 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Introducion; Materials and methods section; Figures 1-8. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elps.200800646 | [Y] - UNYOUNG KIM ET AL, "Simultaneous sorting of multiple bacterial targets using integrated Dielectrophoretic-Magnetic Activated Cell Sorter", LAB ON A CHIP, (20090101), vol. 9, no. 16, doi:10.1039/b903950c, ISSN 1473-0197, page 2313, XP055206917 [Y] 1-4,8-15 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Experimental section; Figures 1-4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b903950c | by applicant | WO2011108454 | JP2016057313 | - PLOS ONE, (20130400), vol. 8, no. 4, page e61770 |