EP3309706 - MOBILE IMAGING BARCODE SCANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hand Held Products, Inc. 9680 Old Bailes Road Fort Mill, SC 29707 / US | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Chen HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
XIAN, Tao HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
REN, Jie HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 04 /
POLONIEWICZ, Paul HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2018/16] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17195085.0 | 05.10.2017 | [2018/16] | Priority number, date | CN201610889181 | 12.10.2016 Original published format: CN201610889181 | US201615296611 | 18.10.2016 Original published format: US201615296611 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3309706 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3309706 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
G06K7/10732 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | MOBILER BILDGEBENDER BARCODESCANNER | [2018/16] | English: | MOBILE IMAGING BARCODE SCANNER | [2018/16] | French: | LECTEUR DE CODE À BARRES PAR IMAGERIE MOBILE | [2018/16] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 05.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19209443.1 / EP3629224 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2017 | AL | 01.01.2020 | AT | 01.01.2020 | CY | 01.01.2020 | CZ | 01.01.2020 | DK | 01.01.2020 | EE | 01.01.2020 | ES | 01.01.2020 | FI | 01.01.2020 | HR | 01.01.2020 | IT | 01.01.2020 | LT | 01.01.2020 | LV | 01.01.2020 | MC | 01.01.2020 | MK | 01.01.2020 | MT | 01.01.2020 | NL | 01.01.2020 | PL | 01.01.2020 | RO | 01.01.2020 | RS | 01.01.2020 | SE | 01.01.2020 | SI | 01.01.2020 | SK | 01.01.2020 | SM | 01.01.2020 | TR | 01.01.2020 | BG | 01.04.2020 | NO | 01.04.2020 | GR | 02.04.2020 | IS | 01.05.2020 | PT | 27.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 05.10.2017 | |
AL | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.10.2017 | |
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 01.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006133757 (NUNNINK LAURENS [NL]) [X] 1* paragraph [0043]; figure 8 *; | [X]US2007091332 (NUNNINK LAURENS [NL]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039]; figures 5,6 *; | [XI]US2011008035 (MESSINA MICHAEL C [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0063]; figures 8A-8D * [I] 3-5; | [XAI]US2012002957 (PASTORE TIMOTHY M [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0050]; figure 4 * [A] 10 [I] 3-9,11,12 |