EP3300032 - A SYSTEM FOR OBTAINING VEHICLE TELEMATICS DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/13] | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING VEHICLE TELEMATICS DATA | ||
[2020/10] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 28.03.2024 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Discovery Limited 155 West Street 2196 Sandton / ZA | For all designated states Cambridge Mobile Telematics 1 Broadway 14th Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIROD, Lewis David 67 Scituate Road Arlington, Massachusetts 02476 / US | 02 /
OSSIN, Ilan 39 Trevanne 2 mansion Rd Glenhazel 2192 Johannesburg / ZA | 03 /
BALAKRISHNAN, Hari 9 Preble Gardens Road Belmont, Massachusetts 02478 / US | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/22] |
Former [2018/13] | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17195551.1 | 31.10.2014 | [2018/13] | Priority number, date | US201461985644P | 29.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461985644 P | [2018/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3300032 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3300032 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/00, G07C5/08 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
G07C5/008 (EP,US);
H04Q9/00 (US);
G01C21/166 (EP,US);
G07C5/0858 (EP,US);
G06Q40/08 (US);
H04Q2209/00 (US);
H04Q2209/10 (US);
H04Q2209/20 (US);
H04Q2209/40 (US);
H04Q2209/50 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] |
Former [2018/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM ERHALT VON FAHRZEUGTELEMATIKDATEN | [2020/10] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR OBTAINING VEHICLE TELEMATICS DATA | [2020/10] | French: | SYSTÈME D'OBTENTION DE DONNÉES DE TÉLÉMATIQUES DE VÉHICULE | [2020/10] |
Former [2018/13] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERHALT VON FAHRZEUGTELEMATIKDATEN | ||
Former [2018/13] | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING VEHICLE TELEMATICS DATA | ||
Former [2018/13] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION DE DONNÉES DE TÉLÉMATIQUES DE VÉHICULE | Examination procedure | 09.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 11.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14814698.8 / EP3138081 | Divisional application(s) | EP20176656.5 / EP3761272 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.02.2021
10.03.2021
ADMISSIBLE Trak Global Group Global House, Westmere Dr Crewe CW1 6ZD / GB Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/15] | 18.03.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.07.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.10.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 29.11.2022 | Appeal received No. T2518/22 | 29.11.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 15.02.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.02.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MK | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MT | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 27.05.2020 | |
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 27.05.2020 | |
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | IS | 27.09.2020 | |
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006238422 (SCHANTZ HANS G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0022] *; | [A]US2007229248 (MOTT CLIVE A [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0030] * * claims 1-13 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2007247282 (OLSEN JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0077] *; | [A]WO2009070347 (BOEING CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0048] * * claims 1-14 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2013197776 (DAVIDSON MARK J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0074] * | Examination | WO2014118563 | by applicant | US8457880 | WO2014US30174 | Opposition | US7221323 | US2010207769 | GB2471727 | WO2012002121 | US8339244 | US2013204645 | GB2504326 | - "Specification of the Bluetooth System volume 1 Architecture & Terminology Overview", Specification of the Bluetooth System volume 1 Architecture & Terminology Overview, (20131203), vol. 1, no. 158 | - "Core System Package", BLUETOOTH SPECIFICATION Version 4.1 Specification volume 2, (20131203), vol. 2, XP002622397 | - Carlos M Gutierrez, Turner James M, Director Deputy, "FIPS PUB 198-1 FEDERAL INFORMATION PROCESSING STANDARDS PUBLICATION The Keyed-Hash Message Authentication Code (HMAC)", (20080701), URL: http://csrc.nist.gov/publications/fips/fips198-1/FIPS-198-1_final.pdf, (20150318), XP055177549 | - Dang Quynh, "Recommendation for Applications Using Approved Hash Algorithms Recommendation for Applications Using Approved Hash Algorithms", Archived NIST Technical Series Publication NIST Special Publication 800-107, doi:10.6028/NIST.SP.107r1, (20150812), pages 1 - 21, Archived NIST Technical Series Publication NIST Special Publication 800-107, URL: https://nvlpubs.nist.gov/nistpubs/Legacy/SP/nistspecialpublication800-107.pdf, (20210506), XP055801979 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.6028/NIST.SP.107r1 | - Yik-Chung Wu ; Qasim Chaudhari ; Erchin Serpedin, "Clock Synchronization of Wireless Sensor Networks", IEEE Signal Proces sing Magazine, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ., US, US, (20110101), vol. 28, no. 1, doi:10.1109/MSP.2010.938757, ISSN 1053-5888, pages 124 - 138, XP011340309 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSP.2010.938757 | - Y. WANG et al., "Sensing vehicle dynamics for determining driver phone use", Proceeding of the 11th annual international conference on Mobile systems, applications, and services (MobiSys '13, New York, NY, USA, (20130000), doi:10.1145/2462456.2464447, pages 41 - 54, XP055263418 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2462456.2464447 | - Johnston Roger G, "Tamper-indicating seals", American Scientist, (20061101), vol. 94, no. 6, pages 515 - 523, XP055801987 |