EP3311684 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VAPORIZATION OF SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monsees, James 2019 19th Street San Francisco, California 94107 / US | 02 /
Bowen, Adam 360 Elm Street San Mateo, California 94401 / US | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 17195788.9 | 18.07.2006 | [2018/17] | Priority number, date | US20050700105P | 19.07.2005 Original published format: US 700105 P | US20060485168 | 11.07.2006 Original published format: US 485168 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3311684 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3311684 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A24D3/04, A24F1/10, A24D1/14 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
A24F13/04 (EP,US);
A24D1/14 (KR,US);
A24D3/18 (KR);
A24F40/40 (EP,US);
A24F40/42 (EP,US);
A24F40/48 (US);
A24F40/60 (EP,US);
A24F42/10 (EP,US);
A24F42/60 (EP,US);
A24F7/00 (US);
A61M11/042 (EP,US);
A61M11/048 (EP,US);
A61M15/0028 (EP,US);
A61M15/06 (EP,US);
F23Q2/32 (US);
F23Q3/002 (US);
A24F40/20 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0266 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2018/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERDAMPFUNG EINER SUBSTANZ | [2018/17] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VAPORIZATION OF SUBSTANCE | [2018/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE VAPORISATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE | [2018/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 25.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06787864.5 / EP1959766 | EP13189967.6 / EP2754360 | Divisional application(s) | EP18214885.8 / EP3488712 | EP18214897.3 / EP3491947 | EP18214903.9 / EP3488716 | EP18214907.0 / EP3488717 | EP18214917.9 / EP3494817 | EP18214921.1 / EP3494818 | EP19201872.9 / EP3613301 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US720007 (DEXTER EDWIN GRANT [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 32 - line 70; figure - *; | [A]GB1025630 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO) [A] 1-15* example - *; | [A]US3292634 (BEUCLER ORIS W) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 16 - line 48; figure - *; | [A]EP0311581 (SVENSKA TOBAKS AB [SE]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 4 - line 55; figure - *; | [A]US5666977 (HIGGINS CHARLES T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 21 - line 29; figure - * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 22; figure - *; | [A]DE19854012 (REEMTSMA H F & PH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 24 - line 56; figure -; example 1 *; | [A]WO2004064548 (NETZER OMRY [IL]) [A] 1-15 * page 15, line 15 - page 16, line 15; figure 5 * | by applicant | US3792704 | US4020853 | US4219032 | US4848374 | US6164287 | US2004031495 | US2004237974 |