EP3333166 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF N-[5-(3,5-DIFLUORO-BENZYL)-1H-INDAZOL-3-YL]-4-(4-METHYL-PIPERAZIN-1-YL)-2-(TETRAHYDRO-PYRAN-4-YLAMINO)-BENZAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NERVIANO MEDICAL SCIENCES S.R.L. Viale Pasteur, 10 20014 Nerviano (MI) / IT | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBUGIAN, Natale Alvaro Via Germana De Stael, 1 20158 Milan / IT | 02 /
FORINO, Romualdo Via Del Caravaggio, 14 20144 Milan / IT | 03 /
FUMAGALLI, Tiziano Via Dante 46 20069 Trezzano Rosa (MI) / IT | 04 /
ORSINI, Paolo Via Padova, 5 20025 Legnano (MI) / IT | [2018/24] | Application number, filing date | 17195806.9 | 22.05.2013 | [2018/24] | Priority number, date | EP20120169139 | 23.05.2012 Original published format: EP 12169139 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333166 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3333166 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, A61K31/496, A61P35/00 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61K31/497 (RU);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (US);
C07B2200/13 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N-[5-(3,5-DIFLUOR-BENZYL)-1H-INDAZOL-3-YL]-4-(4-METHYL-PIPERAZIN-1-YL)-2-(TETRAHYDRO-PYRAN-4-YLAMINO)-BENZAMID | [2018/24] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF N-[5-(3,5-DIFLUORO-BENZYL)-1H-INDAZOL-3-YL]-4-(4-METHYL-PIPERAZIN-1-YL)-2-(TETRAHYDRO-PYRAN-4-YLAMINO)-BENZAMIDE | [2018/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE N-[5-(3,5-DIFLUORO-BENZYL)-1H-INDAZOL-3-YL]-4-(4-MÉTHYL-PIPERAZIN-1-YL)-2-(TETRAHYDRO-PYRAN-4-YLAMINO)-BENZAMIDE | [2018/24] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 10.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 30.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13724270.7 / EP2855460 | Divisional application(s) | EP19188774.4 / EP3581571 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2013 | AL | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | IE | 22.05.2020 | LU | 22.05.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 22.05.2013 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
IE | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 22.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2009013126 (NERVIANO MEDICAL SCIENCES SRL [IT], et al) [AD] 1-15 * examples 2, 7 ** claims 1, 22-24, 31 * | by applicant | WO2009013126 | - Current Opinion in Chemical Biology, (19990000), vol. 3, pages 459 - 465 | - Carcinogenesis, (20080000), vol. 29, pages 1087 - 1091 |