EP3312550 - STRAIN GAUGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minebea Mitsumi Inc. 4106-73, Oaza Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 3890293 / JP | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inamori, Dohaku c/o Minebea Mitsumi Inc. 4106-73 Oaza Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun Nagano, 389-0293 / JP | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 17195897.8 | 11.10.2017 | [2018/17] | Priority number, date | JP20160206958 | 21.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016206958 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3312550 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3312550 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/16, G01L1/22, H01C17/24 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
G01B7/18 (EP,CN,US);
G01L1/2287 (US);
H01C1/16 (US);
H01C17/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] |
Former [2018/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 25.07.2018 | ME | 25.07.2018 | Validation states | MA | 25.07.2018 | MD | 25.07.2018 | Title | German: | DEHNUNGSMESSER | [2018/17] | English: | STRAIN GAUGE | [2018/17] | French: | JAUGE DE CONTRAINTE | [2018/17] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 25.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.10.2017 | AL | 03.04.2019 | AT | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | DK | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | ES | 03.04.2019 | FI | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | IT | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | NL | 03.04.2019 | PL | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | RS | 03.04.2019 | SE | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | SM | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | PT | 03.08.2019 | IE | 11.10.2019 | LU | 11.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 11.10.2017 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
IE | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.10.2017 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
IE | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
IE | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
IE | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 03.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4146867 (BLANGEARD GERARD, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, lines 13-53; figure 1 *; | [A]US4777826 (RUD JR STANLEY E [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 42 - column 6, line 11; figures 1-2 *; | [A]JPH04133401 (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US2005139018 (HAGGSTROM ROLF P [US]) [A] 1-3* paragraphs [0043] - [0049]; figure 9 * | by applicant | JP5890989B |