EP3309750 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGAKI, Yoshinari c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
NISHIYAMA, Tomohiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Canon Europe Limited European Intellectual Property Group 4 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1AF / GB | [2024/03] |
Former [2018/16] | Garner, Jonathan Charles Stapleton Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 17195945.5 | 11.10.2017 | [2018/16] | Priority number, date | JP20160201256 | 12.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016201256 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3309750 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3309750 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/55 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
G06T7/55 (EP,US);
G06T15/205 (US);
G06T7/344 (US);
G06T7/60 (US);
G06T7/70 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2018/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/16] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD | [2018/16] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2018/16] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 18.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2024 | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 17.01.2024 | |
BG | 17.01.2024 | ||
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004104935 (WILLIAMSON TODD [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2005088515 (GENG Z J [US]) [X] 1-7,9-11 * Table 1; paragraph [0055]; figure 1 * [I] 8; | [A]GB2458305 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2239708 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013174671 (TELEFONICA SA [ES]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2016027179 (TAKAMA YASUFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A] - HILTON ET AL, "Scene modelling from sparse 3D data", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 23, no. 10, ISSN 0262-8856, (20050920), pages 900 - 920, (20050920), XP027617936 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | Examination | - HANSUNG KIM ET AL, A Real-Time 3D Modeling System Using Multiple Stereo Cameras for Free-Viewpoint Video Generation, IMAGE ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 237 - 249, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-44894-5, XP019043784 | by applicant | JPS4839237B |