EP3336542 - METHODS FOR USING A BIOSENSOR TEST STRIP ACCORDING TO A SUBSCRIPTION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacher Strasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROLL, Henning 11895 N. Thornbush Dr. Tucson, AZ 85737 / US | 02 /
CELENTANO, Michael J. 3844 Conifer Lane Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | 03 /
MOORE, Steven 5188 Oldfield Ct. Carmel, IN 46033 / US | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 17196179.0 | 18.06.2004 | [2018/25] | Priority number, date | US20030480199P | 20.06.2003 Original published format: US 480199 P | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3336542 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, G01N27/327 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
G01N33/48771 (EP);
G01N27/3272 (EP);
G01N35/00732 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/41] |
Former [2018/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES BIOSENSORTESTSTREIFENS ENTSPRECHEND EINEM ABONNEMENT-PROGRAMM | [2018/25] | English: | METHODS FOR USING A BIOSENSOR TEST STRIP ACCORDING TO A SUBSCRIPTION PROGRAM | [2018/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D`UTILISATION D'UNE BANDE D'ESSAI DE BIOCAPTEUR SELON UN PROGRAMME DE SUSCRIPTION | [2018/25] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04755694.9 / EP1639366 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1147739 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [Y] 2-8,10-15; | [YD]EP1152239 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [YD] 2-8,10-15* figures 2, 10a-10h *; | [Y]EP1288653 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 2-8,10-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03029804 (ARKRAY INC [JP], et al) [Y] 2-8,10-15 * paragraph [0148]; figures 2,25,26 *; | EP1431758 [ ] (ARKRAY INC [JP]) | by applicant | US4008448 | US4225410 | US4233029 | US4323536 | US4654197 | US4919770 | US5108564 | US5120420 | US5128015 | US5243516 | US5288636 | US5437999 | US5628890 | US5682884 | US5727548 | US5997817 | US6004441 | US6054039 | EP1024358 | JP2000352034 | EP1152239 | US19990411940 | US20010866030 |