EP3297347 - URA UPDATE FOLLOWING RESELECTION TO A CELL SUPPORTING ENHANCED PCH AND CONTROLLED BY A DIFFERENT SNRC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/12] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING PAGING OVER AN HS-DSCH IN CELL_PCH AND URA-PCH STATES | ||
[2020/49] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, 19809 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | For all designated states Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAVE, Christopher R. 255 Baffin, Dollard-des-Ormeaux Montreal, Québec H9A 3J2 / CA | 02 /
PANI, Diana 1950 Lincoln Avenue Apt. 1812 Montreal, Québec H3H 2N8 / CA | 03 /
MILLER, James M. 18 Louisburg Square Verona, NJ New Jersey 07044 / US | 04 /
MARINIER, Paul 1805 Stravinski Brossard, Québec J4X 2J7 / CA | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 17196577.5 | 07.08.2008 | [2018/12] | Priority number, date | US20070955217P | 10.08.2007 Original published format: US 955217 P | US20070969832P | 04.09.2007 Original published format: US 969832 P | US20070986154P | 07.11.2007 Original published format: US 986154 P | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3297347 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3297347 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/02 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
H04W68/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/24 (KR,US);
H04W36/0066 (KR);
H04W36/14 (KR);
H04W76/27 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/12] | Title | German: | URA-AKTUALISIERUNG NACH ZELLENNEUAUSWAHL ZU EINER ZELLE, DIE "ENHANCED PCH" UNTERSTÜTZT UND VON EINEM UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN SNRC KONTROLLIERT WIRD | [2020/49] | English: | URA UPDATE FOLLOWING RESELECTION TO A CELL SUPPORTING ENHANCED PCH AND CONTROLLED BY A DIFFERENT SNRC | [2020/49] | French: | ACTUALISATION DE URA, SUITE À UNE RESÉLECTION VERS UNE CELLULE QUI SOUTIEN DU PCH AMÉLIORÉ ET QUI EST CONTRÔLÉE PAR UN SNRC DIFFÉRENT | [2020/49] |
Former [2018/12] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON PAGING ÜBER EINEM HS-DSCH IN CELL_PCH UND URA-PCH-ZUSTÄNDEN | ||
Former [2018/12] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING PAGING OVER AN HS-DSCH IN CELL_PCH AND URA-PCH STATES | ||
Former [2018/12] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE SUPPORTER LA RADIOMESSAGERIE SUR UN CANAL HS-DSCH DANS DES ÉTATS CELL_PCH ET URA-PCH | Examination procedure | 16.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 16.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 04.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08797321.0 / EP2189032 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol Specification (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.331, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070601), no. V7.5.0, pages 1 - 1429, XP050368007 [Y] 1-13 * page 44, paragraph 7.2.2.1 - page 45, paragraph 7.2.2.1 * * page 65, paragraph 8.1.1.6.5 - page 67, paragraph 8.1.1.6.5 * * page 171, paragraph 8.3.1.1 - page 180, paragraph 8.3.1.3 * * page 298, paragraph 8.5.39 - page 300, paragraph 8.5.40 * * page 604, paragraph 10.3.3.46 - page 606, paragraph 10.3.3.48 * * page 679, paragraph 10.3.6.36d - page 680, paragraph 10.3.6.36d * * page 1390, paragraph B.3.3 - page 1392, paragraph B.3.4.4 * | [Y] - NOKIA, "Solution on Iur Problem with pre-Rel7 SRNC", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-070278, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070208), vol. tsg_ran\WG3_Iu\TSGR3_55\docs, no. St. Louis, Missouri; 20070212, XP050161191 [Y] 1-13 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 4 * * figures 1-3 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Stage 2 updates for Enhanced CELL_PCH and URA_PCH state in FDD", (20070212), pages 1 - 35, 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 #57, R2-070812, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_57/Documents/, (20090105), XP002509339 [A] 1-13 * page 30, paragraph XX - page 31, paragraph XX.1 * * page 32, paragraph YY - page 33, paragraph YY.1 * | [A] - NOKIA, "Update of Enhanced Cell_FACH", (20070507), pages 1 - 7, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3 #56, R3-071005, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG3_Iu/TSGR3_56/docs/, (20090105), XP002509340 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [T] - INTERDIGITAL, "Issues with Legacy UTRAN and Enhanced CELL_FACH State", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #59, R2-073181, (20070820), pages 1 - 2, XP002509345 [T] 1,8 * the whole document * |