EP3389122 - CATHODE CURRENT COLLECTOR, METHOD OF PREPARING THE CATHODE CURRENT COLLECTOR, AND BATTERY WITH THE CATHODE CURRENT COLLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Xinzhimei Technology Co., Ltd. Room 611A, No. 202 Building West Tairan Industrial Park Shatou Street Futain District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG LI, Qiu N° 3 Tangming Road Third Industrial District,Tangwei Village Gongming Street Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17196591.6 | 16.10.2017 | [2018/42] | Priority number, date | CN201710243658 | 14.04.2017 Original published format: CN201710243658 | CN201710619524 | 26.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710619524 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3389122 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/66, C23C14/20, C23C14/56 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
H01M4/668 (EP,US);
H01M4/667 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C23C14/022 (KR);
C23C14/025 (KR);
C23C14/081 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/185 (KR);
C23C14/205 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/30 (EP,US);
C23C14/3414 (KR);
C23C14/35 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/562 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/568 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (CN);
H01M4/0404 (CN);
H01M4/0426 (CN);
H01M4/661 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/662 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/664 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/70 (CN);
C01B21/06 (EP,US);
C01B32/956 (US);
C08F10/06 (US);
C08F14/06 (US);
H01M10/052 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATHODENSTROMKOLLEKTOR, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES KATHODENSTROMKOLLEKTORS UND BATTERIE MIT DEM KATHODENSTROMKOLLEKTOR | [2018/42] | English: | CATHODE CURRENT COLLECTOR, METHOD OF PREPARING THE CATHODE CURRENT COLLECTOR, AND BATTERY WITH THE CATHODE CURRENT COLLECTOR | [2018/42] | French: | COLLECTEUR DE COURANT CATHODIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DU COLLECTEUR DE COURANT CATHODIQUE ET BATTERIE COMPRENANT LE COLLECTEUR DE COURANT CATHODIQUE | [2018/42] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 28.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 06.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0533576 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA]) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 4 - line 12 * * page 4, line 36 - line 50 * * page 5, line 15 - line 27 * * page 9, line 3 - line 24; example 1 *; | [A]WO9738851 (GOULD ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 11,12 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 32 * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 15 ** page 12, line 6 - line 35 *; | [A]JPH11102711 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0019] *; | [I]WO2004059781 (AVESTOR LTD PARTNERSHIP [CA], et al) [I] 1-12 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 25 * * page 5, line 24 - line 33 * * page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 9 * * page 9, line 21 - page 11, line 11 * |