EP3311664 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR KILLING VARROA MITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krüger, Rainer Untersteig 3 88167 Maierhöfen / DE | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 17196704.5 | 16.10.2017 | [2018/17] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2019/01] |
Former [2018/17] | DE201610119694 | 17.10.2016 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3311664 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01M19/00, A01M29/18 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
A01K51/00 (EP);
A01M19/00 (EP);
A01M29/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABTÖTEN VON VARROAMILBEN | [2018/17] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR KILLING VARROA MITES | [2018/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SUPPRESSION DE VARROAS | [2018/17] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2018 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 01.08.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 04.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2008008732 (KAMEI KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 7,8 * column 1, paragraphs 1,9,10,11 * * column 2, paragraph 17 * [A] 1-6; | [XDA]DE3839601 (JANSEN WILHELM [DE]) [XD] 7,8 * column 1, lines 3-7 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 21 * [A] 1-6; | [XDA]DE19800293 (SCHALLER ERICH [DE]) [XD] 7,8 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 1 * [A] 1-6 | by applicant | DE19800293 | DE3839601 |