EP3312247 - INK, INK CARTRIDGE, AND IMAGE RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2019 | Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASADA, Yohei c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
TERADA, Masahiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMURA, Hidetaka c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
TAYA, Akihiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 05 /
OOTSUKA, Masanobu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 06 /
AOTANI, Takaharu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 07 /
KOIKE, Shoji c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 08 /
YOSHIMASA, Yutaka c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 17196743.3 | 17.10.2017 | [2018/17] | Priority number, date | JP20160206518 | 21.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016206518 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3312247 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/322, C09D11/326, C09D11/106 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
C09D11/106 (EP,US);
C09D11/107 (US);
C09D11/108 (US);
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C09D11/326 (EP,US);
B41J2/17503 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2018/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTE, TINTENPATRONE UND BILDAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/17] | English: | INK, INK CARTRIDGE, AND IMAGE RECORDING METHOD | [2018/17] | French: | ENCRE, CARTOUCHE D'ENCRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2018/17] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 25.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1167470 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,4-8 * claims 1, 10-12,14 * * paragraph [0009] * * examples * [I] 2; | [XI]JP2002088289 (CANON KK) [X] 1,3-8 * claims 1, 3, 9, 12-14 * * example 2 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0 10] * [I] 2; | [X]US2015184009 (TSUJI ITARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * example 9 * * paragraph [0028] * | by applicant | JP2013253234 | JPS501292B | - YUAN YU et al., "Coagulation Kinetics of Surface Modified Pigment Particles", International Conference on Digital Printing Technologies, (20020900), pages 383 - 387 | - "Test method for liquid absorbability of paper and cardboard", JAPAN TAPPI, Paper pulp test method |