EP3473197 - BALLOON CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotronik AG Ackerstrasse 6 8180 Bülach / CH | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schäfer, Tobias Bohlweg 2 78176 Blumberg-Fützen / DE | 02 /
Risch, Fabian Vorstadt 13 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Galander, Marcus Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7 - 9 12359 Berlin / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17196972.8 | 18.10.2017 | [2019/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473197 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/3207, A61B17/22, A61M25/10 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
A61B17/320725 (EP);
A61M25/1006 (EP,US);
A61M25/1011 (US);
A61B17/22032 (EP);
A61B2017/22061 (EP);
A61M2025/1072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BALLONKATHETER | [2019/17] | English: | BALLOON CATHETER | [2019/17] | French: | CATHÉTER À BALLONNET | [2019/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 18.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4762130 (FOGARTY THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]US2002045852 (SAAB MARK A [US]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059]; figure 6 *; | [A]US2004143287 (KONSTANTINO EITAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0087]; figures 23, 24 *; | [A]US2013060127 (BURTON DAVID G [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039]; figures 2a,b, 3 *; | [XI]US2013237909 (ORR DAVID E [US]) [X] 1,2,7,12,15 * paragraph [0041]; figure 8 * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063] * [I] 3,4,8,13,14; | [A]US2014324079 (SILVESTRO CLAUDIO [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-3c * | by applicant | DE102004059523 | WO2009046206 | US8348987 |