EP3318519 - AN ALIGMENT DEVICE, CORRESPONDING INFEED OR FILLING MACHINE, AND METHOD FOR ALIGNING A STACK OF CARTON BLANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/19] | AN ALIGMENT DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALIGNING A STACK OF CARTON BLANKS | ||
[2023/39] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A. Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Richard Vitklövervägen 15 SE 261 73 Häljarp / SE | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [2018/19] | Application number, filing date | 17197522.0 | 20.10.2017 | [2018/19] | Priority number, date | EP20160197400 | 04.11.2016 Original published format: EP 16197400 | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3318519 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3318519 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/02 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
B65H1/027 (EP);
B65G57/00 (CN);
B65B43/205 (EP);
B65G57/16 (CN);
B65H2301/4222 (EP);
B65H2404/152 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] |
Former [2018/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSRICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ENTSPRECHENDE ZUFÜHR- ODER FÜLLMASCHINE, UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSRICHTUNG EINES STAPELS VON KARTONZUSCHNITTEN | [2023/39] | English: | AN ALIGMENT DEVICE, CORRESPONDING INFEED OR FILLING MACHINE, AND METHOD FOR ALIGNING A STACK OF CARTON BLANKS | [2023/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIGNEMENT, MACHINE D'ALIMENTATION OU DE REMPLISSAGE CORRESPONDANTE, ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À ALIGNER UNE PILE D'ÉBAUCHES DE CARTON | [2023/39] |
Former [2018/19] | AUSRICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, -SYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN ZUR AUSRICHTUNG EINES STAPELS VON KARTONZUSCHNITTEN | ||
Former [2018/19] | AN ALIGMENT DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALIGNING A STACK OF CARTON BLANKS | ||
Former [2018/19] | DISPOSITIF D'ALIGNEMENT, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À ALIGNER UNE PILE D'ÉBAUCHES DE CARTON | Examination procedure | 27.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 09.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1558688 (BAILEY P E); | [A]RU2179943 (MID CORP [US]); | [A]WO2007005589 (MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS [US], et al); | [A]WO2013184295 (GRAPHIC PACKAGING INT INC [US]) | Examination | US4919414 | US4927321 |