EP3357854 - EXTENDABLE LOADING DEVICE AND CARRIER VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Florquin, Steve Bosstraat 11 3924 Molenstede / BE | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Jacobs, Lambert Inventrans BV Overwegstraat 24 3740 Bilzen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | Jacobs, Lambert Inventrans BVBA Overwegstraat 24 3740 Bilzen / BE | Application number, filing date | 17197886.9 | 24.10.2017 | [2018/32] | Priority number, date | BE20160000161 | 24.10.2016 Original published format: BE 1600161 | [2018/32] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357854 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B66B9/16 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
B66B9/16 (EP);
B60P1/43 (EP);
E06C5/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSZIEHBARES LADEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/32] | English: | EXTENDABLE LOADING DEVICE AND CARRIER VEHICLE | [2018/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF EXTENSIBLE DE CHARGEMENT | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0220343 (P & R SYSTEMS [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]WO2011014114 (TTS SHIPS EQUIPMENT AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [AP]US2017022017 (LOPEZ MICHAEL [US]) [AP] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE202004008044U (HERMANN PAUS MASCHINENFABRIK G [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE202010004589U (MICHEL WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US2016075270 | US5077852 | US5813071 |