EP3309068 - DRIVE SYSTEM FOR AIRCRAFT LANDING GEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRIS, James c/o Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol, Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17198151.7 | 31.03.2015 | [2018/16] | Priority number, date | GB20140005851 | 01.04.2014 Original published format: GB 201405851 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3309068 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64C25/40 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
B64C25/405 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B64C25/34 (US);
F16H1/24 (US);
Y02T50/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR FLUGZEUGFAHRWERK | [2018/16] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM FOR AIRCRAFT LANDING GEAR | [2018/16] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE TRAIN D'ATTERRISSAGE D'AÉRONEF | [2018/16] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 24.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15714007.0 / EP3126229 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 28.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.02.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2014023939 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011308490 (HARTMANN SVEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim 2 * |