EP3476453 - ACRYLAMIDE FREE POLYMER FOR DEWATERING APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAEUSSLER, Matthias Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Goethestr. 22 65239 Hochheim am Main / DE | 02 /
SEFER, Adnan Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Stadtplatz 16 84478 Waldkraiburg / DE | 03 /
RUF, Friedrich Schlossfeld 7 84184 Tiefenbach / DE | 04 /
ERNST, Peter Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Junkerstraße 8 65510 Idstein / DE | 05 /
HOELZL, Gabriele Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Waldeckstraße 8 85405 Nandlstadt / DE | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Graser, Konstanze Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH IPM / Patent & License Management Arabellastrasse 4a 81925 München / DE | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 17198872.8 | 27.10.2017 | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3476453 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D21/01, B01J20/26, C02F1/56, C08F220/06, C08F220/56, // C02F103/08, C02F103/10 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
C02F1/56 (EP,US);
B01D21/01 (EP);
B01J20/264 (EP);
C08F220/06 (EP);
C02F2103/08 (EP);
C02F2103/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F220/06, C08F220/585 (EP,US);
C08F220/06, C08F220/585, C08F220/20 (EP,US);
C08F220/06, C08F220/585, C08F220/54 (US,EP);
C08F220/06, C08F220/585, C08F220/56 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] |
Former [2019/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ACRYLAMIDFREIES POLYMER FÜR ENTWÄSSERUNGSANWENDUNGEN | [2019/18] | English: | ACRYLAMIDE FREE POLYMER FOR DEWATERING APPLICATIONS | [2019/18] | French: | POLYMÈRE EXEMPT D'ACRYLAMIDE POUR DES APPLICATIONS DE DÉSHYDRATATION | [2019/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 04.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/18] | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB723868 (IND TAPE CORP) [X] 1-3,6,7,14 * page 1, line 1 - line 15 * * page 2, line 65 - page 4, line 37 * * claims 1-25 * [I] 4,5,8-13; | [XI]CN102786132 (UNIV SICHUAN NORMAL) [X] 1,2,6,7,14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0019] * * claims 1-6 * [I] 3-5,8-13; | [XI]WO2015136438 (G R S CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGIES S R L [IT]) [X] 1-8,14 * page 1, line 1 - line 16 * * page 5, line 1 - page 11, line 17 * * page 19, line 16 - page 24, line 22 * * examples 3-6,9; tables 1-2 * [I] 9-13; | [XDA]DE102016101417 (CLARIANT LNTERNATIONAL LTD [CH]) [XD] 1,14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0124] * * figures 1-10 *[A] 2-13 | by applicant | WO02083258 | DE102016101417 |