EP3476902 - COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PREVENTION OF DEPOSITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geberit International AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER, Lorenz Riedtlistrasse 67 8006 Zürich / CH | 02 /
WIDLER, Roland Brunnenweg 17 8335 Hittnau / CH | 03 /
PFAFFENROTH, Cornelia Sennhüttenstrasse 3 8615 Wermatswil / CH | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 17199042.7 | 27.10.2017 | [2019/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3476902 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00, C11D1/00, C11D1/94, C09D7/45 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
C11D1/94 (EP);
C09D5/00 (EP);
C09D7/45 (EP);
C11D1/00 (EP);
C09D7/40 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] |
Former [2019/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON ABLAGERUNGEN | [2019/18] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PREVENTION OF DEPOSITS | [2019/18] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DESTINÉE À ÉVITER LES DÉPÔTS | [2019/18] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 30.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002077263 (BAKER KEITH HOMER [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0062] - [0064] *; | [A]US6680001 (KRUEGER DAVID J [US]) [A] 1-14* claims 1,10,11 * |