EP3316094 - DISPLAY DEVICE FOR SENSING FORCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul, 07336 / KR | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, JunSeok 245, LG-ro, Wollong-myeon, Paju-si 10845 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 17199091.4 | 30.10.2017 | [2018/18] | Priority number, date | KR20160143181 | 31.10.2016 Original published format: KR 20160143181 | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3316094 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3316094 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, G09G3/36, G02F1/1339, G06F3/041, G06F3/045 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/0412 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/13338 (KR,US);
G06F3/0414 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02F1/13394 (KR,US);
G06F3/04164 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04166 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | G06F3/041, G06F3/045 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] |
Former [2018/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR MESSUNG VON KRAFT | [2018/18] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE FOR SENSING FORCE | [2018/18] | French: | AFFICHEUR DE DÉTECTION DE FORCE | [2018/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 30.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2017 | AL | 27.11.2019 | AT | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | CZ | 27.11.2019 | DK | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | ES | 27.11.2019 | FI | 27.11.2019 | HR | 27.11.2019 | IT | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | MK | 27.11.2019 | MT | 27.11.2019 | PL | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | RS | 27.11.2019 | SE | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | SM | 27.11.2019 | TR | 27.11.2019 | BG | 27.02.2020 | NO | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | PT | 19.04.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.10.2017 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015338967 (CHERN YANN-CHERNG [TW], et al); | [Y]EP2990913 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [IY]US2016188050 (UCHIYAMA YUICHI [JP]) |