EP3399722 - MOBILE ROUTING SYSTEM AND RELATED PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New Tinxs NV Vaartdijkstraat 19/A 8200 Brugge / BE | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pollet, Gery Grote Thems 1A 8200 Brugge / BE | 02 /
De Mol, Koen Kapellestraat 6B 8750 Wingene / BE | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | LC Patents Kempische Steenweg 542A 3500 Hasselt / BE | [2018/45] | Application number, filing date | 17199349.6 | 31.10.2017 | [2018/45] | Priority number, date | EP20170169057 | 02.05.2017 Original published format: EP 17169057 | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3399722 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04W88/16, H04L12/28 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04L12/2825 (EP);
H04L12/2834 (EP);
H04L12/413 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILES ROUTINGSYSTEM UND ZUGEHÖRIGE PLATTFORM | [2018/45] | English: | MOBILE ROUTING SYSTEM AND RELATED PLATFORM | [2018/45] | French: | SYSTÈME DE ROUTAGE MOBILE ET PLATEFORME ASSOCIÉE | [2018/45] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/42] | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015081904 (GUEDALIA ISAAC DAVID [IL], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0068] *; | [X]US2017048790 (PRATAPA CHAITANYA [IN], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058] *; | [X]KR101773173B (LEE SANG KUK [KR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0060] *; | [X] - Anonymous, "linxs - World's Smartest Mobile Router and Sensor Hub", (20170901), URL: https://cdn.webdoos.io/newtinxs/9333f5bd75e0e2a1a304e9537410f23d.pdf, (20180418), XP055468097 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [L] - Anonymous, "Partner gerelateerde persberichten - New Tinxs lanceert "Linxs", werelds meest geavanceerde mobiele router", Brugge, (20170504), URL: https://www.imec-int.com/nl/artikelen/new-tinxs-lanceert-linxs-werelds-meest-geavanceerde-mobiele-router, (20180418), XP055468101 [L] 1-15 * page 1 - page 4 * |