EP3316143 - PERFORMANCE PROFILING OF A GRAPHICS UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imagination Technologies Limited Imagination House Home Park Estate Kings Langley, Hertfordshire WD4 8LZ / GB | [2022/51] |
Former [2018/18] | For all designated states Imagination Technologies Limited Home Park Estate Kings Langley Hertfordshire WD4 8LZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOO, Yoong-Chert c/o Imagination Technologies Limited Imagination House Home Park Estate Kings Langley, Hertfordshire WD4 8LZ / GB | [2022/52] |
Former [2018/18] | 01 /
FOO, Yoong-Chert c/o Imagination Technologies Limited, Legal Department Home Park Estate Kings Langley, Hertfordshire WD4 8LZ / GB | Representative(s) | Slingsby Partners LLP 1 Kingsway London WC2B 6AN / GB | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 17199467.6 | 31.10.2017 | [2018/18] | Priority number, date | GB20160018358 | 31.10.2016 Original published format: GB 201618358 | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3316143 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3316143 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3316143 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/34, // G06T15/00, G06F11/30 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
G06F11/3476 (EP,US);
G06F11/34 (GB,US);
G06T1/20 (US);
G06F11/3419 (EP,US);
G06T15/005 (EP,US);
G06F11/348 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | G06F11/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSPROFILIERUNG EINER GRAFIKEINHEIT | [2018/18] | English: | PERFORMANCE PROFILING OF A GRAPHICS UNIT | [2018/18] | French: | PROFILAGE DE PERFORMANCES D'UNE UNITÉ GRAPHIQUE | [2018/18] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 04.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.12.2022 | AT | 28.12.2022 | CZ | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | ES | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | IT | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | NL | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | RS | 28.12.2022 | SE | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7519797 (STIEHL GREGORY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * whole document *; | [A]WO2010141612 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14* whole document *; | [YA]US2011154337 (CORMACK CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [Y] 10-13 * paragraph [0005]; figures 2,6,79 * [A] 1-9,14,15; | [IAY]EP2470995 (SONY COMP ENTERTAINMENT EUROPE [GB]) [I] 1,4-8,14,15 * figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0028] * [A] 3 [Y] 2,9-13; | [Y]US2014118370 (HAKURA ZIYAD S [US], et al) [Y] 2,9 * paragraph [0038] *; | [A] - JUSTIN WHITNEY, "Tools and Techniques for GPU Performance Profilling", INTERNET CITATION, (20070924), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://developer.amd.com/documentation/articles/pages/9242007176.aspx, (20100920), XP002602129 [A] 1-14 * whole document * | Examination | US2008100627 |