EP3327780 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states Guangdong Oppo Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Cheng No. 18, Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 17199868.5 | 03.11.2017 | [2018/22] | Priority number, date | CN20161179701 | 29.11.2016 Original published format: CN201611079701 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3327780 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H04N5/347 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
H01L27/14621 (EP,US);
H04N25/44 (EP,CN,US);
H04N25/46 (EP,CN,US);
G06T3/4007 (CN);
G06T3/4015 (EP,US);
G06T5/00 (US);
H04N23/55 (CN);
H04N23/843 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/88 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2018/22] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2018/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2018/22] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 03.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 11.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.03.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2008062290 (LAHAV ASSAF [IL], et al); | [Y]US2015029358 (KAIZU SHUN [JP]) |