EP3480667 - CABLE PROCESSING MACHINE CONTROL SYSTEM, CABLE PROCESSING MACHINE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING AND CONTROLLING CABLE PROCESSING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOMAX HOLDING AG Industriestrasse 6 6036 Dierikon / CH | [2022/40] |
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states KOMAX HOLDING AG Industriestrasse 6 6036 Dierikon / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMMENEGGER, Daniel Kastanienbaumstrasse 198 6047 Kastanienbaum / CH | 02 /
ARPAGAUS, Beat Humligenweid 2 6386 Wolfenschiessen / CH | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 17200401.2 | 07.11.2017 | [2019/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480667 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3480667 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, G05B15/00, G05B19/042 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP,US);
G05B19/4063 (US);
B21F23/00 (US);
G05B2219/24168 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31121 (US);
G05B2219/32365 (US);
G06F1/163 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/19] | G05B15/00, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] |
Former [2019/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | 06.11.2019 | Title | German: | KABELVERARBEITUNGSMASCHINENSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM, KABELVERARBEITUNGSMASCHINENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERWACHEN UND STEUERN VON KABELVERARBEITUNGSMASCHINEN | [2019/19] | English: | CABLE PROCESSING MACHINE CONTROL SYSTEM, CABLE PROCESSING MACHINE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING AND CONTROLLING CABLE PROCESSING MACHINES | [2019/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE MACHINES DE TRAITEMENT DES CÂBLES, SYSTÈME DE MACHINES DE TRAITEMENT DES CÂBLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE COMMANDE DE MACHINES DE TRAITEMENT DES CÂBLES | [2019/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 06.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2017 | AL | 05.10.2022 | BG | 05.10.2022 | CY | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | ES | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | MK | 05.10.2022 | MT | 05.10.2022 | NL | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | TR | 05.10.2022 | AT | 07.11.2022 | IE | 07.11.2022 | LU | 07.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | FR | 05.12.2022 | GB | 05.01.2023 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 07.11.2017 | |
AL | 05.10.2022 | ||
BG | 05.10.2022 | ||
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
MK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
TR | 05.10.2022 | ||
AT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 07.11.2017 | |
AL | 05.10.2022 | ||
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
MK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
TR | 05.10.2022 | ||
AT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 07.11.2017 | |
AL | 05.10.2022 | ||
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
MK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
AT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 07.11.2017 | |
AL | 05.10.2022 | ||
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
AT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.11.2017 | |
AL | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
AT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
AT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 05.12.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
GB | 05.01.2023 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 05.10.2022 | |
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 05.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012239221 (MIGHDOLL LEE [US], et al); | [A]EP2913961 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]); | [XI]EP3067769 (SCHLEUNIGER HOLDING AG [CH]) |