EP3318199 - SURGICAL TOOL ASSEMBLY WITH COMPACT FIRING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEARDSLEY, John 14 Killen Road Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 02 /
NICHOLAS, David 148 Cottage Street Trumball, Connecticut 06611 / US | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2018/19] | Application number, filing date | 17200406.1 | 07.11.2017 | [2018/19] | Priority number, date | US201615345689 | 08.11.2016 Original published format: US201615345689 | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3318199 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3318199 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, // A61B17/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/072 (US);
A61B17/29 (US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07271 (US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/19] | A61B17/072, // A61B17/00, A61B17/29 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] |
Former [2018/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE INSTRUMENTENANORDNUNG MIT KOMPAKTER AUSLÖSUNGSANORDNUNG | [2022/06] | English: | SURGICAL TOOL ASSEMBLY WITH COMPACT FIRING ASSEMBLY | [2018/19] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'OUTIL CHIRURGICAL COMPORTANT UN ENSEMBLE DE DÉCLENCHEUR COMPACT | [2022/06] |
Former [2018/19] | CHIRURGISCHE INSTRUMENTENANORDNUNG MIT KOMPAKTER ABSCHUSSANORDNUNG | ||
Former [2018/19] | ENSEMBLE D'OUTIL CHIRURGICAL COMPORTANT UN ENSEMBLE DE TIR COMPACT | Examination procedure | 02.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 02.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2017 | AL | 06.07.2022 | AT | 06.07.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | CY | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | DK | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | MK | 06.07.2022 | MT | 06.07.2022 | NL | 06.07.2022 | PL | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SE | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | LU | 07.11.2022 | PT | 07.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 07.11.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 07.11.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 07.11.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.11.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 07.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 06.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005023324 (DOLL KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * claim 1 * * figures 1,2,11,25,27 ** paragraphs [0011] , [0044] , [0097] *; | [X]US2015173749 (SHELTON IV FREDERICK E [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1, 65, 70, 83 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0161] * * paragraph [0167] * * paragraphs [0173] , [ 174] * | by applicant | US8512359 | US9055943 |