EP3483694 - VEHICLE CONTROL PANEL COMPRISING A SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation Intellectual Property VAK - HBBVN 40 531 Göteborg / SE | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Detlefsen, Anders Skansvägen 18 461 98 Trollhättan / SE | 02 /
Setterberg, Johan Träringen 9 416 79 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
Clemente, Moises Runhällsgatan 5 423 48 Torslanda / SE | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17200705.6 | 09.11.2017 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483694 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3483694 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05G1/02, H01H23/00, H01H23/12 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G05G1/02 (EP,US);
H01H21/22 (US);
H01H1/2041 (US);
H01H21/08 (US);
H01H23/003 (EP,US);
H01H23/12 (EP,US);
H01H1/36 (EP,US);
H01H2223/004 (US);
H01H2223/044 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2019/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGINSTRUMENTENTAFEL MIT EINEM SCHALTER | [2019/20] | English: | VEHICLE CONTROL PANEL COMPRISING A SWITCH | [2019/20] | French: | PANNEAU DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE COMPRENANT UN COMMUTATEUR | [2019/20] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 15.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2017 | AL | 28.10.2020 | AT | 28.10.2020 | CY | 28.10.2020 | CZ | 28.10.2020 | DK | 28.10.2020 | EE | 28.10.2020 | ES | 28.10.2020 | FI | 28.10.2020 | HR | 28.10.2020 | LT | 28.10.2020 | LV | 28.10.2020 | MC | 28.10.2020 | MK | 28.10.2020 | MT | 28.10.2020 | NL | 28.10.2020 | PL | 28.10.2020 | RO | 28.10.2020 | RS | 28.10.2020 | SE | 28.10.2020 | SI | 28.10.2020 | SK | 28.10.2020 | SM | 28.10.2020 | TR | 28.10.2020 | IE | 09.11.2020 | LU | 09.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | BG | 28.01.2021 | NO | 28.01.2021 | GR | 29.01.2021 | IS | 28.02.2021 | PT | 01.03.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.11.2017 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
MT | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
TR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 09.11.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 09.11.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 28.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003022731 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD, et al); | [A]US2014231233 (MORI KOJI [JP], et al) |