EP3312204 - SILANE-FUNCTIONALIZED HYDROCARBON POLYMER MODIFIERS FOR ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOK, Edward J. 610 N Commons View Drive Huffman, TX Texas 77336 / US | 02 /
DIAS, Anthony J. 918 Noble Springs Road Houston, TX Texas 77062 / US | 03 /
CLAASSEN II, Robert J. 5650 Plantation Drive Baytown, TX Texas 77523-8483 / US | 04 /
UHI, Eugene R. 7542 Weatherston St. NW Massillon, 44646 / US | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 17200796.5 | 25.08.2011 | [2018/17] | Priority number, date | US20100392765P | 13.10.2010 Original published format: US 392765 P | US20100392751P | 13.10.2010 Original published format: US 392751 P | US201161508238P | 15.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161508238 P | US201161508226P | 15.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161508226 P | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3312204 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/14, C08F32/06, C08L23/20, C08L9/00 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
C08F279/00 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,KR,US);
B29B9/065 (EP,US);
B29B9/12 (EP,US);
B29D30/06 (EP,US);
B60C1/00 (EP,KR,US);
B60C1/0008 (US);
B60C1/0016 (KR,US);
B60C1/0041 (US);
C08C19/25 (EP,US);
C08F8/42 (EP,US);
C08J3/12 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (KR,US);
C08K9/06 (KR);
C08L101/02 (US);
C08L101/10 (US);
C08L23/22 (EP,US);
C08L45/00 (US);
C08L47/00 (US);
C08L51/003 (US);
B29K2009/00 (US);
C08F10/14 (EP,US);
C08J2351/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/86 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/42, C08F240/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Title | German: | SILANFUNKTIONALISIERTE KOHLENWASSERSTOFFPOLYMERMODIFIKATOREN FÜR ELASTOMERE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2018/17] | English: | SILANE-FUNCTIONALIZED HYDROCARBON POLYMER MODIFIERS FOR ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS | [2018/17] | French: | MODIFICATEURS POLYMÈRES HYDROCARBONÉS FONCTIONNALISÉS PAR SILANE POUR COMPOSITIONS ÉLASTOMÈRES | [2018/17] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 09.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11757708.0 / EP2627680 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2213688 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-13 * example D *; | [X]EP2213687 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-13* examples B, C * | by applicant | US4472538 | US4810734 | US4889885 | EP0926265 | US2007015853 | US7294644 | US7294664 | US7501460 | - RUBBER TECHNOLOGY, Chapman & Hall, (19950000), pages 209 - 581 | - THE VANDERBILT RUBBER HANDBOOK, R.T. Vanderbilt Col., Inc., (19900000), pages 105 - 122 | - KRESGE; WANG, 8 KIRK-OTHMER ENCYCLOPEDIA OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., (19930000), pages 934 - 955 | - RUBBER TECHNOLOGY, Chapman & Hall, (19950000), pages 179 - 208 |