EP3324019 - A METHOD FOR SCAVENGING SMALL PARTICLES FROM A TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2022/19] |
Former [2018/21] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NASIR, Shakeel HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
SHEORAN, Yogendra Yogi HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
SCHUGARDT, John HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 04 /
AUKLAND, Daniel HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 05 /
MANSOUR, Mahmoud HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 06 /
FROST, Cristopher HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 07 /
GREENMAN, Matthew HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17200875.7 | 09.11.2017 | [2018/21] | Priority number, date | US201615352839 | 16.11.2016 Original published format: US201615352839 | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3324019 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/00, F04D29/44, F04D29/70 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
F02C7/00 (EP);
F02C7/052 (US);
F04D29/444 (EP);
F04D29/701 (EP);
F02C3/04 (US);
F05D2250/52 (EP);
F05D2260/607 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON PARTIKELN AUS DEM LUFTSTROM EINER TURBOMASCHINE | [2018/21] | English: | A METHOD FOR SCAVENGING SMALL PARTICLES FROM A TURBINE ENGINE | [2018/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE PARTICULES PRÉSENTES DANS UN FLUX DE MOTEUR À TURBINE | [2018/21] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 09.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/44] | 23.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007144139 (KAWAMOTO OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1* figures 2,4 *; | [X]US2007235373 (STRANGMAN THOMAS E [US], et al) [X] 1,11,13,15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0027]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2015354461 (MEIER JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2,4 *; | [X]US2016186601 (MANNING ROBERT FRANCIS [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0022] , [0029] - [0031] - [0037] , [0038] , [0043] , [0049]; figures 2,3,5 * |