EP3483780 - CLASSIFICATION AND IDENTIFICATION SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKIDATA AG Untersbergstrasse 40 5083 Grödig/Salzburg / AT | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMZIC, Armin SKIDATA AG Untersbergstraße 40 Grödig A-5083 Salzburg / AT | 02 /
WENNINGER, Christian SKIDATA AG Untersbergstraße 40 Grödig A-5083 Salzburg / AT | 03 /
KOEPPL, Felix SKIDATA AG Untersbergstraße 40 Grödig A-5083 Salzburg / AT | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Karakatsanis, Georgios Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Schönfelstraße 26 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Karakatsanis, Georgios Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Dietlindenstrasse 18 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17201187.6 | 10.11.2017 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483780 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/32 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G01D21/02 (CN);
G01S15/86 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06T7/521 (CN);
G06T7/593 (US);
G06T7/73 (US);
G06V20/10 (CN);
G07G1/0063 (US);
G07G1/0072 (US);
G06T2207/10012 (CN);
G06T2207/30128 (US);
G06V20/68 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLASSIFIZIERUNGS- UND IDENTIFIZIERUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2019/20] | English: | CLASSIFICATION AND IDENTIFICATION SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2019/20] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CLASSIFICATION ET D'IDENTIFICATION | [2019/20] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 14.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/20] | 03.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.09.2020 | 16.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5083638 (SCHNEIDER HOWARD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0672993 (NOVAK JEFFREY M [US]) [X] 1,7,14,15 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 4, paragraph last - column 5, paragraph 1 * * column 5, paragraph 2 * * column 6, paragraph 2 - column 6, paragraph last * * column 8, paragraph last - column 9, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US2011215147 (GONCALVES LUIS F [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2014036630 (HERWIG NATHANIEL CHRISTOPHER [US]) [X] 1,7,14,15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US2014064570 (MIYAKOSHI HIDEHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015109451 (DHANKHAR MUKUL [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]JP2015194791 (NEC CORP) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0060] *; | [A]US2017249491 (MACINTOSH BRIAN T [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2017150590 (SIGNPOST CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2007043036 |