EP3336487 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A LASER RANGE-FINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2018/25] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH P.O. Box 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noe, Stefan Honigwiesenstr. 58 70563 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Wieland, Christoph Kaltentaler Str. 22 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/25] | Application number, filing date | 17201607.3 | 14.11.2017 | [2018/25] | Priority number, date | DE201610225275 | 16.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016225275 | [2018/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3336487 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00, G01S17/02, G01S17/08, G01B11/02 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
G01C15/008 (EP);
G01S17/86 (EP,CN);
G01C3/08 (CN);
G01S17/08 (EP,CN);
G01S7/51 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] |
Former [2018/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES LASERENTFERNUNGSMESSGERÄTS | [2018/25] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A LASER RANGE-FINDER | [2018/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE DISTANCE LASER | [2018/25] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 20.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102006013707 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055]; figure 5 *; | [I]EP2051102 (LEICA GEOSYSTEMS AG [CH]) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]DE102011003495 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * [I] 3,5,7; | [A]EP2918972 (LEICA GEOSYSTEMS AG [CH]) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2016069678 (GRACE MICHAEL [IR], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0080]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE102012214880 | EP2669707 |