EP3324336 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND CARRIER MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2020/19] |
Former [2018/21] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, SADAO c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
OKADA, DAISUKE c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
KIMURA, SUKEHIRO c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, TABITO c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
OHBAYASHI, YOHICHIROH c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
KUBOZONO, HIROKI c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 07 /
YOSHIDA, JUN c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 08 /
AMANO, SEIYA c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2024/26] |
Former [2018/21] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17201981.2 | 16.11.2017 | [2018/21] | Priority number, date | JP20160224921 | 18.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016224921 | JP20170176859 | 14.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017176859 | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3324336 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3324336 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/26, G06V20/58 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
G06V10/267 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | G06K9/00, G06K9/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND TRÄGERMITTEL | [2018/21] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND CARRIER MEANS | [2018/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET MOYENS DE SUPPORT | [2018/21] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 16.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013182114 (ZHANG ZHONG [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2012017650 | JP2014096005 |